Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing to $20,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain military retirement income for individuals who are at least 55 years old; increasing to $10,000 the amount of a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain retirement income attributable to a resident's employment as a correctional officer, a law enforcement officer, or a fire, rescue, or emergency services personnel; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0951
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0488 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021, July 1, 2022, July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2021
Legislative Date
1/18/2021
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Military and Public Safety Retirement Income
Senate 1/18/2021 1/18/2021 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/16/2021 1:26 PM
Click to return on the top page