Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Sponsored by
Senators West, Nathan-Pulliam, Carozza, Eckardt, Salling, and Serafini
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a dental practice to be owned, managed, or operated by a licensed dentist, subject to certain exceptions; authorizing an unlicensed person to take certain actions; prohibiting a licensed dentist from raising a certain defense in a certain action; repealing a certain exemption from the requirements of the Maryland Dentistry Act; authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to take certain action against certain applicants and licensees for accepting or tendering rebates or split fees; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0470
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Hough) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {654536/1
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-17)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Jennings) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/14 (Senator Hough) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments {654536/1 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Committee Amendment Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (28-18) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {523425/1 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (22-22) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Floor Amendment {453124/2 (Senator Hough) Rejected (13-32) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Rosapepe) Rejected (21-25) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Board of Dental Examiners - Ownership, Management, or Operation of a Dental Practice
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Third Reading Passed (29-17) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2019 3/15/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-101, 4-102, 4-103, 4-301, 4-315 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page