Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupation Boards - Criminal History Records Checks - General Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a health occupation board to adopt regulations requiring applicants for an initial license or certificate to have a criminal history records check; authorizing a health occupation board to adopt regulations requiring applicants for reinstatement of a lapsed license or certificate, removal from inactive status, or renewal of a license or certificate to have a criminal history records check; requiring an applicant to submit specified fingerprints and fees to obtain a criminal history records check; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604732/1
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604732/1
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604732/1
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway)
Proceedings
44
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable with Amendments {604732/1 42
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 42
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable with Amendments {604732/1 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Special Order until 3/13 (Senator Middleton) Adopted 43
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments {604732/1 44
Senate 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Conway) 44
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM