Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsored by
Senators Peters, Currie, and McFadden
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Information Technology to analyze the logistics of intercepting horse racing winnings to pay for child support or restitution arears, study the use of specified intercept methods by the State for child support enforcement and restitution collection, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0707
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2016
Legislative Date
1/29/2016
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {447578/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {885963/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2016 1/29/2016 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {447578/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means 43
House 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/31/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Favorable with Amendments {885963/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2016 3/27/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2016 3/28/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2016 3/31/2016 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM