Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a specified prohibition on requiring an employee or a prospective employee to take a polygraph examination or similar test as a condition of prospective or continued employment does not apply to an individual employed as a correctional officer or in any other capacity that involves direct personal contact with an inmate in the Carroll County Detention Center.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0565
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
2/28/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Senate 2/03/2017 2/06/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/28/2017 2/28/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Text - Third - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Referred Judiciary 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Text - Chapter - Carroll County - Detention Center - Polygraph Testing
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM