Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing from $20,000 to $60,000 the salary of an attorney employed by the Board of License Commissioners for Anne Arundel County; authorizing the Board to hire an attorney on a contractual basis to perform work that the attorney employed by the Board is unable to perform because of a conflict of interest; and prohibiting the Board from spending more than $30,000 each year to hire a contractual attorney.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0554
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2017
Legislative Date
2/01/2017
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
37
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Senate 2/01/2017 2/01/2017 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Favorable Adopted 37
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Second Reading Passed 37
Text - Third - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
Senate 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 39
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Referred Economic Matters 41
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 831
Text - Chapter - Anne Arundel County - Alcoholic Beverages - Board of License Commissioners - Attorneys
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-101, 11-102, 11-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM