Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Jennings, and Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that a homeowner submit a specified application to the Department of Assessments and Taxation to receive the homestead property tax credit; repealing specified deadlines and procedures for filing the application for the homestead property tax credit; repealing a requirement that the Comptroller assist the Department with specified matters relating to applications for the homestead property tax credit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0996
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM