Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring insurance producers who sell, solicit, or negotiate bail bonds to receive continuing education that directly relates to bail bond insurance.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0451
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2017
Legislative Date
2/17/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-3)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Favorable Adopted 23
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Second Reading Passed 23
Text - Third - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/17/2017 2/17/2017 Referred Economic Matters 28
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-3) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 185
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Bail Bondsmen - Continuing Education Requirements
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-116 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM