Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Essential Goods and Services
Sponsored by
Senators King, Manno, Montgomery, Peters, Ramirez, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell essential goods and services during a state of emergency for a price of more than 10% above the price charged by that person for those goods and services a specified time prior to the state of emergency; prohibiting a person from selling or offering to sell repair or reconstruction services or services used for emergency cleanup for a price of more than 10% above the price charged by that person for those services immediately prior to the state of emergency; creating an exception; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/25/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2013
Legislative Date
2/05/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/07/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2013 1/25/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2013 1/25/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2013 2/05/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/07/2013 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-1101 through 14-1104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM