Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Membership
Sponsored by
Senators Salling, Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kagan, Norman, Reilly, Rosapepe, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the membership of the Maryland Transportation Authority to include specified members of the General Assembly as nonvoting members of the Authority serving in an advisory capacity only; specifying criteria concerning the appointment, tenure, and compensation of the legislative members of the Authority; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0639
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM