Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Including an electric bicycle in the defined term "bicycle" for the purposes of the Maryland Vehicle Law; defining the term "electric bicycle" as a vehicle designed to be operated by human power with the assistance of an electric motor and other specified characteristics; and establishing that the definitions of "moped", "motorized minibike", and "motor vehicle" do not include an electric bicycle.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {940513/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 40
Senate 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Second Reading Passed 40
Senate 3/10/2014 3/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41A
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters 44
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable with Amendments {940513/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-104, 11-117.1, 11-134.1, 11-134.4, 11-135, 13-102, 13-104, 16-101, 17-104.1, 21-1207.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM