Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Employees - Merit Increases in Salary
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Excluding State employees represented by the State Law Enforcement Officers Labor Alliance who are subject to a step increase effective April 1, 2016, in accordance with and consistent with a specified collective bargaining agreement negotiated with the State from a specified prohibition against specified merit increases in salary.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0454
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549532/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments {549532/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/10/2016 3/10/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 First Reading Appropriations 43
House 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2016 3/29/2016 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/07/2016 4/07/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 23
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM