Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Acupuncture Board and State Board of Dietetic Practice - Action and Penalties for Violations of Practice Acts and Supervisory Authority of Acupuncturists
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Acupuncture Board to impose a penalty if the Board finds that there are grounds to take disciplinary action against a licensee; authorizing the State Acupuncture Board and the State Board of Dietetic Practice to issue cease and desist orders or obtain injunctive relief for violations of specified provisions of law; authorizing an acupuncturist, licensed by the Board to practice clinical professional counseling, to provide supervision to an individual performing auricular detoxification; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0304
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {954636/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2014
Legislative Date
2/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {596687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-3)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-2)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2014 2/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments {954636/1 Report Adopted 31
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Senate 2/25/2014 2/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 33
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Favorable with Amendments {596687/1 Report Adopted 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
House 4/02/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (129-3) 62
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Senate Concur - House Amendments 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-2) 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Passed Enrolled 60
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1A-101, 1A-310.1, 1A-314.1, 1A-316, 1A-401, 1A-402, 1A-403, 5-101, 5-401, 5-402, 5-403, 5-404, 5-405 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM