Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Transportation - Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Salling
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Francis Scott Key Bridge Authority to finance, construct, operate, and maintain the Francis Scott Key Bridge; providing for the members, appointment, terms, chair, and staff of the Authority; prohibiting the Department of Transportation from exercising jurisdiction or authority over the Francis Scott Key Bridge; authorizing the Authority to take specified actions in the performance of its duties; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4.5-101 through 4.5-412, 4-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM