Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman and Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a hospital that downsizes to pay a fee directly to the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation if workers are displaced; requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission to prorate the total amount of specified fees among all hospitals in a specified manner to derive the individual fee for each hospital; requiring the Department to establish a program for retraining and placement of specified hospital employees; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0932
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {957372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Serafini) Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (40-7)
Proceedings
64
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Economic Impact Statements
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments {957372/1 Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Serafini) Adopted 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63A
Text - Third - Hospitals - Changes in Status - Hospital Employee Retraining and Placement
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (40-7) 64
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-326.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM