Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Sponsored by
Senators King, Astle, Benson, Conway, Currie, DeGrange, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kagan, Kasemeyer, Kelley, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Middleton, Miller, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Peters, Pinsky, Ramirez, Robinson, Rosapepe, Smith, Young, Zirkin, and Zucker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor to include in the State budget a certain appropriation to the Child Care Subsidy Program each fiscal year; requiring the Governor to appropriate, from all fund sources, funds in the State budget to increase the Child Care Subsidy Program reimbursement rates to a certain amount in certain fiscal years; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0430
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {549937/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-20)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {549937/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Appropriations 50
House 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/27/2018 3/27/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (115-20) 57
Senate 4/02/2018 3/28/2018 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 564
Text - Chapter - Education - Child Care Subsidies - Mandatory Funding Levels
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-101, 9.5-111 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM