Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Registration of Audiology Assistants
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, on or after October 1, 2022, an individual to be registered by the State Board of Examiners for Audiologists, Hearing Aid Dispensers, and Speech-Language Pathologists before assisting in the practice of audiology in the State, except as otherwise provided under certain provisions of law; establishing qualifications to obtain an audiology assistant registration; authorizing a licensed audiologist to provide general supervision for up to two audiology assistants at any time; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0161
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Registration of Audiology Assistants
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2021
Legislative Date
2/02/2021
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Registration of Audiology Assistants
Senate 2/02/2021 2/02/2021 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/18/2021 12:48 PM
Click to return on the top page