Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Sponsored by
Senators Feldman, Hershey, Benson, Oaks, and Rosapepe
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Administration to conduct a study to assess the need in the State for short-term medical insurance offered by nonadmitted insurers; establishing specified requirements for the study; requiring the Administration to solicit input from specified persons in conducting the study; requiring the Administration to submit a specified report to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0774
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2017
Legislative Date
1/26/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {727476/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {776584/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/26/2017 1/26/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Insurance - Surplus Lines - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Procurement From Nonadmitted Insurer
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments {727476/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 46
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {776584/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Text - Chapter - Insurance - Short-Term Medical Insurance - Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM