Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Chiropractors, Massage Therapists, Physical Therapists, and Physical Therapist Assistants - Criminal History Records Checks Required
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring applicants to the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners and the State Board of Physical Therapy Examiners to submit to a criminal history records check as a condition of licensure or registration; requiring the Boards to consider specified factors in determining whether to grant a license or registration on receipt of the criminal history record information; prohibiting the Boards from issuing a license or registration if the criminal history record information has not been received; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0401
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2014
Legislative Date
1/24/2014
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2014
Legislative Date
2/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/24/2014 1/24/2014 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2014 2/14/2014 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 28
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 31
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-302, 13-302.1, 13-305, 13-308, 13-316, 3-302, 3-302.1, 3-303, 3-306, 3-313, 3-5A-06, 3-5A-09, 3-5A-11 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM