Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Administration - Student and Residential Mortgage Loans
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Muse, Norman, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Community Development Administration in the Department of Housing and Community Development to make, participate in making, and undertake a commitment for financial assistance to a homeowner for purchasing a homeowner's primary residence and making payments on the homeowner's student debt under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to determine the terms and qualifications of specified financial assistance to homeowners; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0460
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {670216/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/31/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-3)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/03/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/19/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Favorable 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Special Order until later today (Senator Jennings) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Second Reading Passed 48
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Motion Reconsider Third Reading (Senator Jennings) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 48A
House 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means 52
House 3/22/2016 3/22/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
House 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing cancelled (Ways and Means)
House 3/24/2016 3/24/2016 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 4/04/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Favorable with Amendments {670216/1 Report Adopted 63
House 4/07/2016 3/31/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
House 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-3) 64
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2016 4/03/2016 Passed Enrolled 63
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-235, 4-237, 4-238, 4-240, 4-242 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM