Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person to have a specified license before doing business as a buyer of personal property by means of an automated purchasing machine in the State; requiring applicants for a buyer license and a specified resident agent of an applicant or a licensee to apply for a national and State criminal history records check; requiring a buyer to ensure that each automated purchasing machine that the buyer owns or operates in the State meets specified requirements; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0918
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827772/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2014
Legislative Date
4/14/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable with Amendments {827772/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 57
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 61
House 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 4/14/2014 4/14/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   20-101 through 20-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM