Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Kelley, Madaleno, Mathias, Muse, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Rosapepe, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified authorized providers and prescribers be registered with the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program before obtaining a specified new or renewal registration or by July 1, 2017, whichever is sooner; requiring that specified pharmacists be registered with the Program by a certain date; requiring specified prescribers and pharmacists to request and assess specified drug monitoring data under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0456
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-304 )
(   21-2A-01, 21-2A-02, 21-2A-03, 21-2A-04, 21-2A-04.1, 21-2A-04.2, 21-2A-05, 21-2A-06, 21-2A-08, 21-2A-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM