Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Sponsored by
Harford County Senators
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing certain residency and other requirements for an applicant for an alcoholic beverages license in Harford County; requiring that an applicant operate and serve as the manager or supervisor of the business conducted on the licensed premises, be responsible for the operation of the license, and be physically present on the licensed premises daily for a substantial amount of time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Holder Requirements
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Economic Matters 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-1402 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:02 PM