Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Benson, Conway, Currie, King, Lee, Manno, Middleton, Muse, Peters, Robinson, Young, Oaks, Ferguson, McFadden, and Madaleno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that a certain applicant or licensee is subject to a certain minority business participation goal established by the Special Secretary for the Office of Small, Minority, and Women Business Affairs; requiring a certain certification agency, in consultation with the General Assembly and the Office of the Attorney General, to study the Minority Business Enterprise Program to evaluate the program's compliance with certain requirements and to report to the Legislative Policy Committee by December 14, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1622
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {259234/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {259234/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Ways and Means 33
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing canceled
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text - Chapter - Video Lottery Terminals - Minority Business Participation Goals - Sunset Extension
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM