Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Law Enforcement Purchases Account within the Compassionate Use Fund; authorizing a law enforcement representative to obtain a certain amount of medical cannabis and medical cannabis concentrate from a licensed dispensary at no cost for use during a certain training program; requiring a dispensary or dispensary agent to ensure that all medical cannabis and products containing medical cannabis have a label affixed to the product that warns against the operation of an automobile or machinery while using the product; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2019
Legislative Date
2/06/2019
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Cannabis Commission - Law Enforcement and Dispensaries
Senate 2/06/2019 2/06/2019 Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-3301, 13-3303.1, 13-3304.1, 13-3306, 13-3307, 13-3309, 13-3313 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM