Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Substance Use Disorder Treatment Programs - Performance Measures and Assessment Criteria
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt regulations setting standards that use the American Society of Addiction Medicine criteria for treatment, care, and rehabilitation of individuals with a substance use disorder; requiring, on or before January 1 of each year, the Behavioral Health Administration to submit a copy of a specified evaluation to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2015
Legislative Date
2/17/2015
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/17/2015 2/17/2015 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM