Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, King, Manno, Peters, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Jennings, Hershey, Klausmeier, Middleton, Reilly, Rosapepe, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to initiate an investigation of certain nursing home complaints alleging actual harm within 10 business days after receiving the complaint; requiring the Department to make every effort to investigate within 24 hours complaints alleging immediate jeopardy to residents of certain nursing homes; requiring the Department to develop a certain data dashboard; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {117679/1 Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {753520/1 (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments {117679/1 Adopted 38
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 38
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Mathias) Adopted 38
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Motion Special Order until 3/5 (Senator Mathias) Adopted 38
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Floor Amendment {753520/1 (Senator Mathias) Adopted 39
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Text - Third - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 41
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 41
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Text - Chapter - Maryland Nursing Home Resident Protection Act of 2018
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-1408, 19-1408.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM