Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Young)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a person seeking to construct a natural gas pipeline to apply for a certain water quality certification and pay a nonrefundable fee; requiring the Department of the Environment to establish a certain fee for the submission and review of a water quality certification application; specifying how the Department will determine the amount of the fee; requiring that the fee be deposited, credited, and appropriated in a certain manner; providing certain criteria for the Department's review of certain applications; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0669
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384233/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/20/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {384233/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Young) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {384233/1 52
Senate 3/22/2019 3/20/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments {384233/1 53
Senate 3/25/2019 3/21/2019 Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Young) Adopted 53
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-601 through 14-615 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM