Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Jennings, Mathias, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the penalties for specified offenses relating to criminal gangs; prohibiting a criminal gang or an individual belonging to a criminal gang from receiving or investing specified proceeds in a specified manner; prohibiting criminal gangs and persons involved with criminal gangs from obtaining specified property under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2016
Legislative Date
2/03/2016
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/03/2016 2/03/2016 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-801 through 9-805, 9-807 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM