Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Astle, Feldman, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Oaks, Peters, Reilly, Rosapepe, Zucker, Edwards, and Muse
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Increasing the amount of a subtraction modification under the State income tax for certain qualifying volunteer fire, rescue, and emergency medical services members for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {819430/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, or Emergency Medical Services Membership
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {819430/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Income Tax – Subtraction Modification – Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Members
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM