Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Liability Insurance - Prohibition on Disclaiming Coverage
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer from disclaiming coverage under a policy of liability insurance on the ground that the insured or a certain person has breached the policy by failing to cooperate with the insurer; and making a conforming change.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2019
Legislative Date
1/31/2019
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Hearing canceled (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2019 1/31/2019 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Civil Actions - Liability Insurance - Prohibition on Disclaiming Coverage
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Hearing canceled (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-110 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM