Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration) and Senators Bates, Brochin, Cassilly, Eckardt, Edwards, Hershey, Hough, Jennings, Norman, Ready, Reilly, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Decreasing from $24 to $12 fees for certified copies of specified certificates; and decreasing from $20 to $10 the portion of each fee collected by local health departments required to be transferred to the General Fund.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0459
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
12
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179332/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2016
Legislative Date
3/22/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179332/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Motion reject Committee Amendment (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-29)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted (29-16)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {709631/1 Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2016 1/28/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2016 1/28/2016 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 12
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Favorable with Amendments {179332/1 51
Senate 3/24/2016 3/22/2016 Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted 51
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments {179332/1 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Motion reject Committee Amendment (Senator Ready) Rejected (16-29) 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Committee Amendment Adopted (29-16) 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Floor Committee Amendment (Budget and Taxation) {709631/1 Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 53
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM