Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task Force
Sponsored by
Senator Raskin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2014, to display a specified poster relating to food allergies; requiring, on or before January 1, 2014, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Restaurant Association of Maryland and Food Allergy Research and Education, to create and make available on its Web site a specified poster; establishing a Task Force to Study Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading; requiring a report on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0009
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {697677/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {697677/1 Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/02/2013 4/02/2013 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2013 4/03/2013 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 66
House 4/08/2013 4/02/2013 Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/08/2013 4/03/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 67
Senate 4/08/2013 4/05/2013 Returned Passed 67
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 251
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM