Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Due Process Hearings for Children With Disabilities - Burden of Proof
Sponsored by
Senators Montgomery, Bates, Benson, Guzzone, Kelley, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Ramirez, Raskin, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified public agencies to bear a specified burden of proof in due process hearings that are held to resolve a dispute relating to the provision of a free appropriate public education; providing a specified exception for a parent or guardian seeking tuition reimbursement for a unilateral placement; and establishing that a specified provision of law is not intended to change specified record-keeping requirements or what constitutes a free appropriate public education under federal or State law.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0344
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM