Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsored by
Senators Pipkin, Brinkley, and Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012; repealing specified provisions of law relating to the adoption of specified growth tier designations by specified local jurisdictions; repealing a prohibition against the sale or development of specified land unless specified documentation is provided to the Department of the Environment; repealing the requirement that under specified circumstances a local jurisdiction alter the contents of a specified plan; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0106
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0445 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/20/2013 2/21/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1110, 9-206 )
(   1-401, 1-501 through 1-509, 5-104, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM