Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors - Licenses, Permits, and Registrations - Processes and Criminal History Records Checks
Sponsored by
Senator Montgomery
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Clarifying that a specified process for regulating crematories must provide for the registration of crematory operators or the issuance of permits for operating crematories; requiring specified applicants to the State Board of Morticians and Funeral Directors to submit to a specified criminal history records check or submit to the Board a criminal history records check conducted by an accredited agency approved by the Board; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2015
Legislative Date
2/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {974937/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/04/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/11/2015 2/11/2015 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {974937/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45A
House 3/31/2015 3/31/2015 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2015 4/09/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/10/2015 4/04/2015 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 65
Senate 4/11/2015 4/04/2015 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 167
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-205, 7-301.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM