Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Sponsored by
Senator Peters
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting, to between 6 a.m. and midnight, the hours during which a certain person in possession of a vehicle that has been towed or removed from a parking lot is required to provide an opportunity for the vehicle owner or the owner's agent to retake possession of the vehicle; and altering a certain signage requirement imposed on the owner or operator of a parking lot relating to hours during which a towed vehicle may be reclaimed.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2020
Legislative Date
2/20/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Towing or Removal of Vehicles From Parking Lots - Reclamation Hours
Senate 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2020 2/20/2020 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 2:49 PM