Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Refund Program
Sponsored by
Senators Frosh, Ferguson, Madaleno, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Raskin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a beverage distributor operating within the State to register with the Department of the Environment on or before April 1, 2015; requiring a redeemable beverage container sold in the State to bear specified information indicating a refund value of 5 cents beginning January 15, 2016; requiring the payment of specified deposits by specified distributors, retailers, and consumers under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Finance and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1733 through 9-1741 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM