Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hazing
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Feldman, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Pinsky, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that the offense of hazing is committed by subjecting a student to the risk of serious bodily injury regardless of whether injury actually occurs; and increasing the penalty from $500 to $5,000 for a specified offense relating to subjecting a student to the risk of serious bodily injury for the purpose of an initiation into a student organization of a school, college, or university.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0448
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0806 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2015 3/23/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM