Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2031, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; and requiring, on or before December 31 each year, the Board to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the Board's disciplinary activities for the previous fiscal year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0549
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 2:49 PM