Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Relief and Tax Fairness Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senators Pinsky, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Forehand, Frosh, Gladden, Jones-Rodwell, Kelley, Madaleno, Manno, Montgomery, Muse, Ramirez, Raskin, Rosapepe, Stone, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified fees collected by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation for the filing of specified documents by specified corporations and business entities; requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified combined reporting method; requiring, subject to specified regulations, specified groups of corporations to file a combined income tax return reflecting the aggregate income tax liability of all the members of the group; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1298
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0469 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-402.1, 10-811 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM