Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin, Benson, Feldman, King, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Nathan-Pulliam, Peters, Pinsky, Pugh, Rosapepe, Young, and Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual who is convicted of a specified alcohol offense to participate in the Ignition Interlock System Program for specified periods of time and to successfully complete the Program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/06/2015 Text - First - Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2015
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-404.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM