Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Physicians and the related allied health advisory committees by extending to July 1, 2030, the termination provisions relating to statutory and regulatory authority of the State Board of Physicians and the committees; altering the reasons for which a disciplinary panel of the Board is authorized to deny a certain license or refuse to renew or reinstate an applicant's license under certain circumstances; altering the content of a certain annual report by the Board to include certain information; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0560
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 5 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Senate 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/24/2020 2:50 PM