Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condemnation Proceedings - Compensation and Payment of Fees
Sponsored by
Senator Zirkin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that the award of damages when land, or any part of it, is taken in a specified condemnation proceeding by specified entities is three times the fair market value of the part taken; authorizing that the fair market value of property in condemnation proceedings by specified entities be determined in a specified manner; requiring the condemnation authority to pay all costs of a specified appraisal; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1097
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2013
Legislative Date
2/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2013 2/06/2013 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-104, 12-105, 12-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM