Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the amount of an additional service charge to the lesser of the actual cost or $5 that an owner, an operator, or a manager of an apartment house, an office building, or a shopping center may collect to cover certain administrative costs of installing submetering equipment for each dwelling unit or commercial rental unit that is not individually metered for gas or electricity, allocating the cost of each unit's consumption, and billing the cost to each unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2018
Legislative Date
1/25/2018
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {327372/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-4)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/25/2018 1/25/2018 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Favorable with Amendments {327372/1 Adopted 30
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30
Text - Third - Public Utilities - Apartment Houses and Commercial Buildings - Service Charges
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-4) 32
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Referred Economic Matters 33
House 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-303, 7-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM