Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the applicability of specified provisions of law relating to the Motor Vehicle Administration's collection and forwarding of Selective Service registration information to women and minors between the ages of 17 and 25 years; altering the conditions under which specified information about an applicant is forwarded to the Selective Service System; repealing specified provisions relating to federal funds for the collection and electronic forwarding of Selective Service registration information; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0772
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0050 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {828471/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {828471/1 Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM