Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Security Systems Services - Complaint Investigations
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of State Police to conduct an investigation that relates to any complaint alleging that an unauthorized person has provided security systems services; and specifying requirements for the complaint.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/23/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2014 1/23/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/21/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 32
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 Second Reading Passed 32
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 34
House 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 First Reading Economic Matters 37
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/26/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 58
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 Second Reading Passed 58
House 3/28/2014 3/23/2014 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 59
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 57
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-205, 18-501, 18-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM