Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environmental Health Specialists - Licensure Examinations - Applicant Qualifications and Waiver
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified educational qualification that an applicant for licensure as an environmental health specialist may meet to qualify to be examined under a specified provision of law; altering the circumstances under which the State Board of Environmental Health Specialists may waive licensure examination requirements; and altering the qualifications that an applicant must meet to qualify for a waiver of examination requirements under a specified provision of law.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2013 1/28/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Second Reading Passed 36
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations 40
House 3/13/2013 3/13/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 60A
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Second Reading Passed 60A
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Returned Passed 61A
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 254
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-304, 21-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM