Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to develop and make available a standardized form for a BSL-3 laboratory for specified purposes; requiring the laboratories to report specified information to the Department on or before September 30, 2018, and on or before September 30 each subsequent year; requiring the Department to report, on or before December 31, 2018, and on or before December 31 each subsequent year, the number and location of the laboratories, in total and by local jurisdiction, to specified State officials; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1172
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0699 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2017
Legislative Date
1/27/2017
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/27/2017 1/27/2017 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Biosafety Level 3 Laboratories
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM