Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Underground Utility Damage Prevention - Connecting Buildings to Water Supply Systems and Sewerage Systems - Detectable Wires
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Bates, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Benson, Feldman, Kelley, and Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that any new or replacement piping that is buried or installed for the purpose of connecting a building to a water supply system or sewerage system be buried or installed with an insulated copper tracer wire that is suitable for direct burial and has an American wire gauge (AWG) of at least 10, or an equivalent product that makes the piping detectable; providing for the prospective application of the Act; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0341
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/03/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {557370/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
39
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {663695/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2015 2/06/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2015 3/03/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Favorable with Amendments {557370/1 Report Adopted 35
Senate 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Senate 3/06/2015 3/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 37
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 First Reading Economic Matters 39
House 4/01/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {663695/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-223.1 )
(   12-129, 24-107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM